Back
Multiplication
> ... Math > Multiplication and Division > Multiplication

While we can memorize single digit multiplication, we can’t memorize all multiplication problems. Instead, we use single digit multiplication and some steps to solve large multiplication problems. The following video will teach these steps. If you have a different method of doing multiplication, you can use the method you are comfortable with.

### Scripture Connection

In Matthew 18: 22, Jesus taught Peter about forgiveness. Peter asks if he should forgive his brother seven times but Jesus replies, “I say not unto thee, Until seven times: but Until seventy times seven.” We might think this gives us permission to stop forgiving someone after forgiving them 490 times, but Elder Bruce R. McConkie explained that this really means “there is no limit to the number of times men should forgive their brethren.” (The Mortal Messiah: From Bethlehem to Calvary, 4 vols. [1979-81], 3:91).

Multiplying by one digit

## Steps for Multiplication:

1. Put number with most digits on top of the number with fewer digits.
2. Start with the bottom number furthest to the right. Multiply it to all the digits in the top number one by one starting at the right and going left.

3. If the numbers in the first column multiplied together are greater than 9, then carry the first digit of their solution into the next column. (Example: $$8 × 2 = 16$$. Carry the 1 into the tens column and write the 6 below the ones column in the solution area.)

4. Continue by multiplying the bottom rightmost number to the number in the next place value to the left in the top number and add any number that was carried into that column to this solution.
5. Continue following this pattern of multiplying the rightmost number in the bottom to all the digits in the top and writing the solution in the solution area and carrying anything greater than 9 to the next column.

Multiplying multiple digits follows the same pattern as multiplying a single digit, as shown in the video above, it just takes a few more steps. The following video shows these steps and works through an example.

Multiplying with multiple digits

If you are multiplying by more than one digit just follow the same steps as when working with one digit, but include the following:
6. After multiplying all the digits in the top number by the bottom right digit, move to the next digit to the left in the bottom number and repeat the process, but be sure to start a new solution line and include a 0 in the rightmost column of the solution line.

7. When you have repeated this process for all the digits in the bottom number, add the lines in the solution together.

This works because what we are really doing is multiplying each place value in the bottom number by each place value in the top number and adding them together.

If you’re trying to do the practice problems and it’s taking a very long time, it might be helpful for you to review and memorize your single-digit multiplication ($$1 × 1$$ to $$9 × 9$$). If you have all of the single-digit multiplication problems memorized, it will make these problems a lot easier. It will also make the math in future lessons easier.

(Additional videos and practice problems can be found on the left side of the screen after selecting the above Khan Academy links.)

### Practice Problems

Evaluate the following expression:
1. $$22 \times 3 = ?$$ (
Solution
Solution: 66
Details:
Analyze the multiplication of $$22 \times 3$$ in parts.
First, 22 can be broken into two parts: 2 tens or 20, and 2 ones. Multiply $$20 \times 3$$.
$$20 \times 3 = {\color{green} 60}$$

Next, multiply the second part, 2 by 3.
$$2 \times 3 = {\color{green} 6}$$

The answer to each separate part multiplied by 3 is 60 and 6.
$${\color{green} 60 + 6} = {\color{red } 66}$$

The 66 represents the answer to our original problem of $$22 \times 3$$.
)
2. $$70 \times 5 = ?$$ (
Solution
Solution: 350
Details:

$$7 \times 5 = 35$$

But we are actually multiplying $$70 \times 5$$ in this problem and 70 is $$7 \times 10$$.
So for our final answer, we multiply the $$35 \times 10$$ which becomes 350.
(See the lesson on Multiplying and Dividing by Powers of 10)

$$70 \times 5 = 350$$
)
3. $$75 \times 48 = ?$$ (
Video Solution
Solution: 3600
Details:

(Video Source | Transcript)
)
4. $$542 \times 14 = ?$$ (
Solution
Solution:
$$7,588$$
)
5. $$294 \times 400 = ?$$ (
Solution
Solution:
$$117,600$$
)
6. $$876 \times 204 = ?$$ (
Video Solution
Solution: $$178,704$$
Details:

(Video Source | Transcript)
)
7. $$807 \times 655 = ?$$ (
Solution
Solution:
$$528,585$$
)

## Need More Help?

1. Study other Math Lessons in the Resource Center.
2. Visit the Online Tutoring Resources in the Resource Center.